THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:02:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carla Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Henderson (CPSO#: 107051 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carla Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Henderson (CPSO#: 107051 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLA YVONNE HENDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLA YVONNE HENDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015