THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2829 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 1G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8073451170
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 980 Oliver Rd.
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 6846000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suit 204
1139 Alloy Drive
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6M8
Phone: (807) 345-1170
Fax: (807) 768-1580

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Azadeh Mofid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mofid (CPSO#: 107059 )
Business Address: Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Department of Internal Medicine
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 204-1139 Alloy Dr
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6M8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2829 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 1G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8073451170
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 980 Oliver Rd.
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 6846000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suit 204
1139 Alloy Drive
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6M8
Phone: (807) 345-1170
Fax: (807) 768-1580

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Azadeh Mofid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mofid (CPSO#: 107059 )
Business Address: Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Department of Internal Medicine
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 204-1139 Alloy Dr
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6M8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZADEH MOFID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZADEH MOFID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015