THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:50:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Catolica De Pelotas, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
North Eastern Ontario
Centre for Kids
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carolina Bohrer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bohrer (CPSO#: 107060 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
705 523 7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidade Catolica De Pelotas, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
North Eastern Ontario
Centre for Kids
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carolina Bohrer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bohrer (CPSO#: 107060 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
705 523 7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINA VALDUGA BOHRER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOHRER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINA VALDUGA BOHRER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOHRER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Catolica De Pelotas, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015