THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:04:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. T. ESMAIL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Esmail (CPSO#: 107061 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. T. ESMAIL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Esmail (CPSO#: 107061 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARIQ ESMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESMAIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARIQ ESMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESMAIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015