THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:31:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third St
Welland County Hospital
Emergency Department
Welland ON L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057326111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: STEPHENSON B. STROBEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Strobel (CPSO#: 107087 )
Business Address: 6073191821

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third St
Welland County Hospital
Emergency Department
Welland ON L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057326111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: STEPHENSON B. STROBEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Strobel (CPSO#: 107087 )
Business Address: 6073191821

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHENSON BAINES STROBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STROBEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHENSON BAINES STROBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STROBEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015