THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:24:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Citrus Medical Centre
2240 Lakeshore Bvld, Unit 107
Toronto Ontario M5E 1Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-800-6500
Extension: 2
Fax: 416-342-1790

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Pham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pham (CPSO#: 107132 )
Business Address: Citrus Medical Centre
Unit 107
2240 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke Ontario M8V 0B1
(416) 800-6500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Citrus Medical Centre
2240 Lakeshore Bvld, Unit 107
Toronto Ontario M5E 1Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-800-6500
Extension: 2
Fax: 416-342-1790

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Pham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pham (CPSO#: 107132 )
Business Address: Citrus Medical Centre
Unit 107
2240 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke Ontario M8V 0B1
(416) 800-6500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA MAISA PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA MAISA PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015