THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:51:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Grand River Hospital
Department of Neurology
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197494300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Neurology
Room 402 McMaster Wing, Box 339
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 May 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arjun Vishnu Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sharma (CPSO#: 107145 )
Business Address: 315-399 Elizabeth Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 0A4
2899831431

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Grand River Hospital
Department of Neurology
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197494300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Neurology
Room 402 McMaster Wing, Box 339
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 May 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arjun Vishnu Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sharma (CPSO#: 107145 )
Business Address: 315-399 Elizabeth Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 0A4
2899831431

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARJUN VISHNU SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARJUN VISHNU SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Apr 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015