THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:16:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dartmouth Medical School, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Downsview Xray and Ultrasound
201-2830 Keele St
Toronto Ontario M3M 3E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Interventional Radiology
Effective: 05 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Interventional Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. G. TARULLI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tarulli (CPSO#: 107153 )
Business Address: 201-2830 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M3M 2G8

Corporation Name: DR. M. G. TARULLI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dartmouth Medical School, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Downsview Xray and Ultrasound
201-2830 Keele St
Toronto Ontario M3M 3E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Interventional Radiology
Effective: 05 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Interventional Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. G. TARULLI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tarulli (CPSO#: 107153 )
Business Address: 201-2830 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M3M 2G8

Corporation Name: DR. M. G. TARULLI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASSIMO GABRIELE TARULLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARULLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASSIMO GABRIELE TARULLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARULLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dartmouth Medical School, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015