THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:17:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Centre
60 Murray St. 2L-409, Box 22
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 8597
Fax: (647) 837-5819

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. NATHAN CHAN SMYTH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chan Smyth (CPSO#: 107169 )
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
Suite 2l-409, Box 22
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 8597

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Centre
60 Murray St. 2L-409, Box 22
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 8597
Fax: (647) 837-5819

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. NATHAN CHAN SMYTH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chan Smyth (CPSO#: 107169 )
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
Suite 2l-409, Box 22
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 8597

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHAN GEOFFREY CHAN SMYTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN SMYTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHAN GEOFFREY CHAN SMYTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN SMYTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015