THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:19:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Kakulu Road
Med Team Clinic
Suite 103
Ottawa Ontario K2L 3C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 592-1448
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Canadian Forces Health Services Centre Ottawa
Care Delivery Unit 3
4th floor
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-945-1111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yiming Wei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wei (CPSO#: 107173 )
Business Address: Suite 204
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata Ontario K2L 3C8
(613) 592-1269
Business Address: 99 Kakulu Road
Suite 103
Ottawa Ontario K2L 3C8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Kakulu Road
Med Team Clinic
Suite 103
Ottawa Ontario K2L 3C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 592-1448
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Canadian Forces Health Services Centre Ottawa
Care Delivery Unit 3
4th floor
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-945-1111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yiming Wei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wei (CPSO#: 107173 )
Business Address: Suite 204
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata Ontario K2L 3C8
(613) 592-1269
Business Address: 99 Kakulu Road
Suite 103
Ottawa Ontario K2L 3C8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIMING WEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIMING WEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015