THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 04:16:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-740-4940
Fax: 519-740-7722

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lin (CPSO#: 107179 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 740-4940

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-740-4940
Fax: 519-740-7722

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lin (CPSO#: 107179 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 740-4940

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELEN LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELEN LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015