THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:37:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-3530 Derry Rd E
Ontario Medical Examiners - Mississauga (Malton)
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 (800) 233-0382
Fax: 1 (905) 225-6524
Address: 715 Coronation Blvd
Ontario Medical Examiners - Cambridge
Suite 4
Cambridge ON N1R 7R1
Phone: 1 (226) 895-1175
Fax: 1 (226) 474-0113
Address: 40-1770 Albion Rd
Releva Chronic Pain Centre
Etobicoke ON M9V 1C2
Phone: +1 (416) 747-8008
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I. Salim Dahmis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Salim Dahmis (CPSO#: 107182 )
Business Address: 103-3530 Derry Rd E
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3
1 (800) 233-0382
Business Address: 4-715 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 7R1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-3530 Derry Rd E
Ontario Medical Examiners - Mississauga (Malton)
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 (800) 233-0382
Fax: 1 (905) 225-6524
Address: 715 Coronation Blvd
Ontario Medical Examiners - Cambridge
Suite 4
Cambridge ON N1R 7R1
Phone: 1 (226) 895-1175
Fax: 1 (226) 474-0113
Address: 40-1770 Albion Rd
Releva Chronic Pain Centre
Etobicoke ON M9V 1C2
Phone: +1 (416) 747-8008
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I. Salim Dahmis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Salim Dahmis (CPSO#: 107182 )
Business Address: 103-3530 Derry Rd E
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3
1 (800) 233-0382
Business Address: 4-715 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 7R1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMAD OMAR SALIM DAHMIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIM DAHMIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMAD OMAR SALIM DAHMIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIM DAHMIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015