THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:38:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario
L6M 0L8
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Extension: 3057
Fax: 905-338-4115
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia Ontario
N7T 6S3
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ketan Ghate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ghate (CPSO#: 107183 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario
L6M 0L8
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Extension: 3057
Fax: 905-338-4115
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia Ontario
N7T 6S3
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ketan Ghate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ghate (CPSO#: 107183 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KETAN GHATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHATE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KETAN GHATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHATE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015