THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:04:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-271 Cornwall Rd
Oakville Allergy & Asthma Specialists
Oakville ON L6J 7Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053372112
Fax: 2893513026

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. DUA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Dua (CPSO#: 107200 )
Business Address: 201-271 Cornwall Rd
Oakville Allergy & Asthma Specialists
Oakville ON L6J 7Z5
(905)337-2112
Business Address: 200-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Westoak Medical Clinic
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
9055827533

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-271 Cornwall Rd
Oakville Allergy & Asthma Specialists
Oakville ON L6J 7Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053372112
Fax: 2893513026

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. DUA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Dua (CPSO#: 107200 )
Business Address: 201-271 Cornwall Rd
Oakville Allergy & Asthma Specialists
Oakville ON L6J 7Z5
(905)337-2112
Business Address: 200-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Westoak Medical Clinic
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
9055827533

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENINDER SINGH DUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENINDER SINGH DUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015