THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:11:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204B-245 Pelham Rd
St. Catharines ON L2S 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2894790273
Fax: 9052270217

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Machado Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Machado (CPSO#: 107233 )
Business Address: 261 Martindale Rd.
St. Catharines Ontario L2W 1A1
905-682-4534
Business Address: Unit 6 - 261 Martindale Rd.
St. Catharines Ontario L2W 1A1
905-682-4534
Business Address: 204B-245 Pelham Rd
St Catharines ON L2S 1X8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204B-245 Pelham Rd
St. Catharines ON L2S 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2894790273
Fax: 9052270217

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Machado Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Machado (CPSO#: 107233 )
Business Address: 261 Martindale Rd.
St. Catharines Ontario L2W 1A1
905-682-4534
Business Address: Unit 6 - 261 Martindale Rd.
St. Catharines Ontario L2W 1A1
905-682-4534
Business Address: 204B-245 Pelham Rd
St Catharines ON L2S 1X8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA MACHADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACHADO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA MACHADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACHADO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015