THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:26:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universit‚ d'Antananarivo, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 - 25 Woodbines Downs Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-2273
Fax: (416) 741-3542

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Mar 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 28 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Armel Bemmo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bemmo (CPSO#: 107234 )
Business Address: Suite 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
(416) 741-2273

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Universit‚ d'Antananarivo, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 - 25 Woodbines Downs Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-2273
Fax: (416) 741-3542

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Mar 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 28 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Armel Bemmo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bemmo (CPSO#: 107234 )
Business Address: Suite 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
(416) 741-2273

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARMEL BEMMO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEMMO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARMEL BEMMO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEMMO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universit‚ d'Antananarivo, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015