THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:32:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Argentina

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: IRENE TELIAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Telias (CPSO#: 107242 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Suite 2mcl 411c
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Argentina

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: IRENE TELIAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Telias (CPSO#: 107242 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Suite 2mcl 411c
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Nov 2023
16 Nov 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 17 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Nov 16 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. IRENE GABRIELA TELIAS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Critical Care, University of Toronto, in which Dr. TELIAS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. TELIAS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. TELIAS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. TELIAS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 November, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 16 November, 2030.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. IRENE GABRIELA TELIAS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Critical Care, University of Toronto, in which Dr. TELIAS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. TELIAS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. TELIAS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. TELIAS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 November, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 16 November, 2030.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 16 Nov 2030

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015