THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Goa Medical College, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1428 Highway 2
Medical Trust Clinics
2nd floor
Courtice ON L1E 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 728-7915
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5-1405 Bloor St
Courtice ON L1E 0A1
Phone: (905) 674-1237
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Medical Trust Clinics
Oshawa Health Center
247,Simcoe street North
First floor
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
Phone: 905-728-7915
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjuta Kharangate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kharangate (CPSO#: 107261 )
Business Address: Medical Trust Clinics
1471 Harmony Road
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K5
(289) 939-8203

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Goa Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1428 Highway 2
Medical Trust Clinics
2nd floor
Courtice ON L1E 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 728-7915
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5-1405 Bloor St
Courtice ON L1E 0A1
Phone: (905) 674-1237
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Medical Trust Clinics
Oshawa Health Center
247,Simcoe street North
First floor
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
Phone: 905-728-7915
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjuta Kharangate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kharangate (CPSO#: 107261 )
Business Address: Medical Trust Clinics
1471 Harmony Road
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K5
(289) 939-8203

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJUTA KESHAV KHARANGATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHARANGATE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANJUTA KESHAV KHARANGATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHARANGATE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Goa Medical College, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015