THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:20:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King's College London GKT School, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Critical Care Medicine
Room D108
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 May 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. N. JIVRAJ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jivraj (CPSO#: 107262 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M3-200 - Dept. Of Anesthesia
Toronto ON M4N 3M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King's College London GKT School, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Critical Care Medicine
Room D108
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 May 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. N. JIVRAJ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jivraj (CPSO#: 107262 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M3-200 - Dept. Of Anesthesia
Toronto ON M4N 3M5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAHEED JIVRAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIVRAJ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAHEED JIVRAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIVRAJ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King's College London GKT School, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015