THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:38:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Cardiology
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-7378582
Fax: 6137396727
Address: 602-2 Gurdwara Rd
Nepean ON K2E 1A2
Phone: 6137149855
Fax: 6137149857
Address: 747 Silver Seven Road
Unit 36
Ottawa Ontario K2V 0A1
Phone: (613) 714-4666
Fax: (613) 270 -0553

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth K. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chan (CPSO#: 107287 )
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Cardiology
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-7378582
Fax: 6137396727
Address: 602-2 Gurdwara Rd
Nepean ON K2E 1A2
Phone: 6137149855
Fax: 6137149857
Address: 747 Silver Seven Road
Unit 36
Ottawa Ontario K2V 0A1
Phone: (613) 714-4666
Fax: (613) 270 -0553

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth K. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chan (CPSO#: 107287 )
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH KAREN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH KAREN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015