THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:34:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
PO Box 1800, 381 Church Street
Markham ON
L3P 7P3
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga, ON
L5M 2N1
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-3971
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 22 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Juss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Juss (CPSO#: 107315 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
PO Box 1800, 381 Church Street
Markham ON
L3P 7P3
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga, ON
L5M 2N1
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-3971
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 22 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Juss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Juss (CPSO#: 107315 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JATINDER KAUR JUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUSS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JATINDER KAUR JUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUSS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2015