THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:41:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ. of Kragujevac Fac. of Med Sciences, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ranka Bulajic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bulajic (CPSO#: 107392 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN
Medical School: Univ. of Kragujevac Fac. of Med Sciences, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ranka Bulajic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bulajic (CPSO#: 107392 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANKA BULAJIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULAJIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANKA BULAJIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULAJIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ. of Kragujevac Fac. of Med Sciences, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 May 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015