THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:38:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National Taiwan University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Toronto
Department of Psychiatry
250 College Street, 8th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 979-6748
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Workman Way, 5th floor
Child, Youth and Family Services
CAMH
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 Jul 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Taiwan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MENG-CHUAN LAI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lai (CPSO#: 107465 )
Business Address: 1080 Bay St
Unit 4310
Toronto ON M5S 0A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE
Medical School: National Taiwan University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Toronto
Department of Psychiatry
250 College Street, 8th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 979-6748
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Workman Way, 5th floor
Child, Youth and Family Services
CAMH
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 Jul 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Taiwan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MENG-CHUAN LAI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lai (CPSO#: 107465 )
Business Address: 1080 Bay St
Unit 4310
Toronto ON M5S 0A5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Sep 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 09 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MENG-CHUAN LAI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of Child and Youth Mental Health, at the University of Toronto, in which Dr. LAI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. LAI no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MENG-CHUAN LAI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of Child and Youth Mental Health, at the University of Toronto, in which Dr. LAI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. LAI no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National Taiwan University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2015