THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:52:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 451 Paxton St
Lakeridge Health Port Perry
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10-10886 Hurontario St
Brampton ON L7A 3R9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 207-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 194 Talbot St W
Emergency Department
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5734 Yonge St
North York Ontario M2M 4E7
Phone: 905-684-9999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1690 Dersan Street
Unit 100
Pickering Ontario L1V 2P8
Phone: (905) 686-8805
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 365 West St
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 340 College St #601
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-9511
Fax: 416-928-9513
Address: Maple via Maple.ca
NA - House Calls
Toronto Ontario M5V 1S2
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435
Address: 123 Edward St #400
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 597-0997
Fax: 416-597-2912

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Cruise Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cruise (CPSO#: 107476 )
Business Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5649
Business Address: 700 Lawrence Ave W Suite 360
North York ON M6A 3B4
(647) 812-2113
Business Address: 3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9E 3N9
(519) 972-3944
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 326-2373

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 451 Paxton St
Lakeridge Health Port Perry
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10-10886 Hurontario St
Brampton ON L7A 3R9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 207-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 194 Talbot St W
Emergency Department
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5734 Yonge St
North York Ontario M2M 4E7
Phone: 905-684-9999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1690 Dersan Street
Unit 100
Pickering Ontario L1V 2P8
Phone: (905) 686-8805
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 365 West St
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 340 College St #601
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-9511
Fax: 416-928-9513
Address: Maple via Maple.ca
NA - House Calls
Toronto Ontario M5V 1S2
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435
Address: 123 Edward St #400
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 597-0997
Fax: 416-597-2912

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Cruise Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cruise (CPSO#: 107476 )
Business Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5649
Business Address: 700 Lawrence Ave W Suite 360
North York ON M6A 3B4
(647) 812-2113
Business Address: 3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9E 3N9
(519) 972-3944
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 326-2373

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN JOSEPH CRUISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUISE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN JOSEPH CRUISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUISE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015