THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:06:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108-790 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169291900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanna Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wong (CPSO#: 107641 )
Business Address: 108-790 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
4169291900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108-790 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169291900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanna Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wong (CPSO#: 107641 )
Business Address: 108-790 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
4169291900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA KA YING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA KA YING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2015