THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Poznan, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 460 King St W
Durham Care Clinic
Lower Level
Oshawa ON L1J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 240 9095
Fax: 905 800 1478

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Handa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Handa (CPSO#: 107648 )
Business Address: 372 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2J9
Business Address: 460 King St W
Oshawa ON L1J 2K9
289 240 9095

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Poznan, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 460 King St W
Durham Care Clinic
Lower Level
Oshawa ON L1J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 240 9095
Fax: 905 800 1478

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Handa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Handa (CPSO#: 107648 )
Business Address: 372 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2J9
Business Address: 460 King St W
Oshawa ON L1J 2K9
289 240 9095

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Nov 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 30 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rishi Handa may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rishi Handa may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Poznan, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2015