THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:00:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3075 Hospital Gate
Healthpath MD Clinic
Suite 113
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-618-9934
Fax: 289-856-8488

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Disera Medical Cen310-31 Disera Dr
Thornhill ON L4J 0A7
Tel: (905) 771-7755
Fax: (905) 771-7752
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 16 Nov 2017

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marta J. Czerner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Czerner (CPSO#: 107694 )
Business Address: unit 113-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
9056189934

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3075 Hospital Gate
Healthpath MD Clinic
Suite 113
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-618-9934
Fax: 289-856-8488

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Disera Medical Cen310-31 Disera Dr
Thornhill ON L4J 0A7
Tel: (905) 771-7755
Fax: (905) 771-7752
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 16 Nov 2017

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marta J. Czerner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Czerner (CPSO#: 107694 )
Business Address: unit 113-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
9056189934

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTA JOANNA CZERNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZERNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTA JOANNA CZERNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZERNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2023
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2015