THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:15:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Sellers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sellers (CPSO#: 107719 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street, Dept of Anesthesia
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Address: 340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Business Address: 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Sellers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sellers (CPSO#: 107719 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street, Dept of Anesthesia
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Address: 340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Business Address: 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL SELLERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELLERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL SELLERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELLERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2015