THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:27:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tavistock Health Centre
80 Maria Street
Tavistock Ontario N0B 2R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 655-2322
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vanessa Kustec Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kustec (CPSO#: 107734 )
Business Address: Tavistock Health Centre
80 Maria Street
Tavistock Ontario N0B 2R0
(519) 655-2322

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tavistock Health Centre
80 Maria Street
Tavistock Ontario N0B 2R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 655-2322
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vanessa Kustec Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kustec (CPSO#: 107734 )
Business Address: Tavistock Health Centre
80 Maria Street
Tavistock Ontario N0B 2R0
(519) 655-2322

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANESSA ELYSE KUSTEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUSTEC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANESSA ELYSE KUSTEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUSTEC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2015