THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:46:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M6R1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Robichaud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Robichaud (CPSO#: 107741 )
Business Address: 212 Franklin Ave
Toronto ON M6P 3Z3
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M6R1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Robichaud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Robichaud (CPSO#: 107741 )
Business Address: 212 Franklin Ave
Toronto ON M6P 3Z3
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES YVES ROBICHAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBICHAUD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES YVES ROBICHAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBICHAUD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2015