THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:02:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ilorin, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 7-2155 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5L 4M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058203633
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 2100-7325 Yonge Street
Innisfil Ontario L9S 2M6
Phone: 7054810135
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mofolasade Sam-Ogunbiyi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sam-Ogunbiyi (CPSO#: 107797 ) Dr. S. Ogunbiyi (CPSO#: 107748 )
Business Address: 50 McKeown St
Thornton ON L0L 2N0
Business Address: 7325 Yonge Street
Suite 2800
Innisfil Ontario L9S 2M6
Business Address: 2800-7325 Yonge St
Innisfil Medical Practice
Innisfil ON L9S 2M6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ilorin, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 7-2155 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5L 4M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058203633
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 2100-7325 Yonge Street
Innisfil Ontario L9S 2M6
Phone: 7054810135
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mofolasade Sam-Ogunbiyi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sam-Ogunbiyi (CPSO#: 107797 ) Dr. S. Ogunbiyi (CPSO#: 107748 )
Business Address: 50 McKeown St
Thornton ON L0L 2N0
Business Address: 7325 Yonge Street
Suite 2800
Innisfil Ontario L9S 2M6
Business Address: 2800-7325 Yonge St
Innisfil Medical Practice
Innisfil ON L9S 2M6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL OLUSEYI OGUNBIYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGUNBIYI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL OLUSEYI OGUNBIYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGUNBIYI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ilorin, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2015