THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:06:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Luke's College of Medicine - William, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, FILIPINO, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Urology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168131500
Extension: 6580
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 14 Feb 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Philippines

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Chua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chua (CPSO#: 107759 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
M299
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
4168131500 Extn: 6899

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, FILIPINO, MANDARIN
Medical School: St. Luke's College of Medicine - William, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Urology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168131500
Extension: 6580
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 14 Feb 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Philippines

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Chua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chua (CPSO#: 107759 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
M299
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
4168131500 Extn: 6899

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ERLANO CHUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ERLANO CHUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Luke's College of Medicine - William, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 29 Feb 2028

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2015