THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:30:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Leamington District Mem Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 322-2501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olaogun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Olaogun (CPSO#: 107808 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Leamington District Mem Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 326-2373

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Leamington District Mem Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 322-2501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olaogun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Olaogun (CPSO#: 107808 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Leamington District Mem Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 326-2373

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAISI OMOLAJA OLAOGUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLAOGUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAISI OMOLAJA OLAOGUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLAOGUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2015