THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:36:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9 - 10 Meadowglen Dr
Whitby Ontario L1R 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 665-3920
Fax: (905) 668-5514

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Aug 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hui Sen Te Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Te (CPSO#: 107815 )
Business Address: 9 - 10 Meadowglen Drive
Whitby Ontario L1R 3P8
(905) 665-3920

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9 - 10 Meadowglen Dr
Whitby Ontario L1R 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 665-3920
Fax: (905) 668-5514

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Aug 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hui Sen Te Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Te (CPSO#: 107815 )
Business Address: 9 - 10 Meadowglen Drive
Whitby Ontario L1R 3P8
(905) 665-3920

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUI SEN TE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUI SEN TE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2015