THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:33:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Case Western Reserve University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ontario Power Generation Building
Radiation Oncology
7th floor
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 13 Apr 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Shultz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shultz (CPSO#: 107841 )
Business Address: 700 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5

Corporation Name: David Shultz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Case Western Reserve University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ontario Power Generation Building
Radiation Oncology
7th floor
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 13 Apr 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Shultz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shultz (CPSO#: 107841 )
Business Address: 700 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5

Corporation Name: David Shultz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Jan 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 13 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. David Benjamin Shultz may practise medicine independently in radiation
oncology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. David Benjamin Shultz may practise medicine independently in radiation
oncology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Case Western Reserve University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2015