THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:31:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3580 Thomas Street
Mississauga Ontario L5M 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 412-1008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 106-250 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON L5B 1J2
Phone: (905) 275-2273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Majid Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussain (CPSO#: 107859 )
Business Address: 3580 Thomas Street
Mississauga Ontario L5M 0G2
(905) 412-1008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3580 Thomas Street
Mississauga Ontario L5M 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 412-1008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 106-250 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON L5B 1J2
Phone: (905) 275-2273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Majid Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussain (CPSO#: 107859 )
Business Address: 3580 Thomas Street
Mississauga Ontario L5M 0G2
(905) 412-1008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAJID HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAJID HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 29 Jul 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2015