THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:36:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Erasmus University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Meno Ya Win Way
Northern Clinic
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8077375182
Fax: 8077374866

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Hummelen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hummelen (CPSO#: 107886 )
Business Address: Northern Clinic
4 Meno Ya Win Way
PO Box 4000
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K2
(807) 737-5160

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH
Medical School: Erasmus University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Meno Ya Win Way
Northern Clinic
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8077375182
Fax: 8077374866

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Hummelen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hummelen (CPSO#: 107886 )
Business Address: Northern Clinic
4 Meno Ya Win Way
PO Box 4000
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K2
(807) 737-5160

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REINDER BENJAMIN SIPHO HUMMELEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMMELEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REINDER BENJAMIN SIPHO HUMMELEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMMELEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Erasmus University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2015