THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:07:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dubai Medical College For Girls, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4372669242
Fax: 4373179611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Haneen Al-Gerrah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al-Gerrah (CPSO#: 107894 )
Business Address: 8-71 Speers Rd
Oakville ON L6K 0J2
2897960052

Corporation Name: Dr. Haneen Al-Gerrah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Dubai Medical College For Girls, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4372669242
Fax: 4373179611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Haneen Al-Gerrah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al-Gerrah (CPSO#: 107894 )
Business Address: 8-71 Speers Rd
Oakville ON L6K 0J2
2897960052

Corporation Name: Dr. Haneen Al-Gerrah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 May 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANEEN DHAFER ALI AL-GERRAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-GERRAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANEEN DHAFER ALI AL-GERRAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-GERRAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dubai Medical College For Girls, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2015