THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:36:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Barrie North Family Medicine clinic
Suite 104
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 792-2145
Fax: (705) 792-2147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shehla Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed (CPSO#: 107916 )
Business Address: Barrie North Family Medicine Clinic
104 - 125 Bellfarm Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
(705) 792-2145

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Barrie North Family Medicine clinic
Suite 104
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 792-2145
Fax: (705) 792-2147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shehla Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed (CPSO#: 107916 )
Business Address: Barrie North Family Medicine Clinic
104 - 125 Bellfarm Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
(705) 792-2145

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEHLA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEHLA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2015