THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:18:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Health Center
department of Medicine, Division of Oncology and Hematology
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mukhtar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mukhtar (CPSO#: 107925 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Health Center
department of Medicine, Division of Oncology and Hematology
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mukhtar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mukhtar (CPSO#: 107925 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYMAN ABDULAZIZ M MUKHTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKHTAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYMAN ABDULAZIZ M MUKHTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKHTAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2015