THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:17:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mimico Medical
398 Royal York Rd
Toronto Ontario M8Y 2R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)201-0836
Fax: (416)259-0184

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Timothy Kodsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kodsi (CPSO#: 107975 )
Business Address: 398 Royal York Road
Toronto Ontario M8Y 2R5
(416) 201-0836
Business Address: Legacy Cloud Medical Clinic
Suite 4
2035 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2J 0A8
(647) 351-1411
Business Address: 909 Royal York Rd
Etobicoke ON M8Y 2V8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mimico Medical
398 Royal York Rd
Toronto Ontario M8Y 2R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)201-0836
Fax: (416)259-0184

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Timothy Kodsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kodsi (CPSO#: 107975 )
Business Address: 398 Royal York Road
Toronto Ontario M8Y 2R5
(416) 201-0836
Business Address: Legacy Cloud Medical Clinic
Suite 4
2035 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2J 0A8
(647) 351-1411
Business Address: 909 Royal York Rd
Etobicoke ON M8Y 2V8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASSEM TIMOTHY KODSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KODSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASSEM TIMOTHY KODSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KODSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2015