THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:52:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Elgin St
St Thomas ON N5R 3L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-207-7701
Fax: 519-207-7711

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ajogwu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ajogwu (CPSO#: 107976 )
Business Address: 19 Elgin St
PRIME POINT MEDICAL CLINIC
St Thomas ON N5R 3L7
5192076601
Business Address: 285 Bridge Street
Port Stanley Ontario N5L 1J5
(519) 782-4195
Business Address: 204 - 5460 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K7
(416) 250-7171

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Elgin St
St Thomas ON N5R 3L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-207-7701
Fax: 519-207-7711

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ajogwu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ajogwu (CPSO#: 107976 )
Business Address: 19 Elgin St
PRIME POINT MEDICAL CLINIC
St Thomas ON N5R 3L7
5192076601
Business Address: 285 Bridge Street
Port Stanley Ontario N5L 1J5
(519) 782-4195
Business Address: 204 - 5460 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K7
(416) 250-7171

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAMBERLAIN EZUGWU AJOGWU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AJOGWU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAMBERLAIN EZUGWU AJOGWU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AJOGWU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2015