THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 300
581 Argus Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-9900
Fax: 905 338 9904

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristin Pandke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pandke (CPSO#: 107977 )
Business Address: 300 - 581 Argus Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J4
(905) 338-9900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 300
581 Argus Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-9900
Fax: 905 338 9904

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristin Pandke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pandke (CPSO#: 107977 )
Business Address: 300 - 581 Argus Road
Oakville Ontario L6J 3J4
(905) 338-9900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIN ELIZABETH PANDKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIN ELIZABETH PANDKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2015