THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:32:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3401 Ridgeway Drive
The Way Medical Clinic
Family Practice
Unit 102,103
Mississauga Ontario L5L 5T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2893271255
Fax: 2893271317
Address: 550 Queens Quay West
Toronto ON M5V 3M8
Phone: (647) 347-0576
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Abdel-Aty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Abdel-Aty (CPSO#: 107979 )
Business Address: 550 Queens Quay West
Toronto Ontario M5V 3M8
(647) 347-0576

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3401 Ridgeway Drive
The Way Medical Clinic
Family Practice
Unit 102,103
Mississauga Ontario L5L 5T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2893271255
Fax: 2893271317
Address: 550 Queens Quay West
Toronto ON M5V 3M8
Phone: (647) 347-0576
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Abdel-Aty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Abdel-Aty (CPSO#: 107979 )
Business Address: 550 Queens Quay West
Toronto Ontario M5V 3M8
(647) 347-0576

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
21 Sep 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 21 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Karim Abdel-Aty may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Karim Abdel-Aty may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Jun 2022
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Jun 2022
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 21 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. Effective: 11 Jul 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015