THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Appletree Medical Centre
4062 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4062 Confederation Pky
Mississauga ON L5B 0G4
Phone: 6477222370
Fax: 2899146023

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vaneet Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Rai (CPSO#: 107986 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Centre
4062 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0G4
(647) 722-2370

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Appletree Medical Centre
4062 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4062 Confederation Pky
Mississauga ON L5B 0G4
Phone: 6477222370
Fax: 2899146023

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vaneet Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Rai (CPSO#: 107986 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Centre
4062 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0G4
(647) 722-2370

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Apr 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 20 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vaneet Rai may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vaneet Rai may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015