THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:33:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Southampton, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-13291 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057737843
Fax: 9057739614
Address: 1849 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Phone: 905-773-7843
Fax: (905) 773-9614
Address: 200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON L4L 9L3
Phone: 905-856-1300
Fax: 905-856-0900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PRAVEEN RANJIT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ranjit (CPSO#: 107991 )
Business Address: 300-13291 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7843
Business Address: 2508-15 Roehampton Ave
Toronto ON M4P 1R4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Southampton, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-13291 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057737843
Fax: 9057739614
Address: 1849 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Phone: 905-773-7843
Fax: (905) 773-9614
Address: 200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON L4L 9L3
Phone: 905-856-1300
Fax: 905-856-0900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PRAVEEN RANJIT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ranjit (CPSO#: 107991 )
Business Address: 300-13291 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7843
Business Address: 2508-15 Roehampton Ave
Toronto ON M4P 1R4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRAVEEN RANJIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANJIT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRAVEEN RANJIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANJIT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Southampton, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2015