THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:19:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bristol Family Physicians &
Walk-In Clinic
2315 Bristol Cir
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 287-2035
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hadeel Altitanchy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Altitanchy (CPSO#: 107995 )
Business Address: Bristol Family Physicians & Walk-In Clinic
Suite 102
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
(905) 287-2035

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bristol Family Physicians &
Walk-In Clinic
2315 Bristol Cir
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 287-2035
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hadeel Altitanchy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Altitanchy (CPSO#: 107995 )
Business Address: Bristol Family Physicians & Walk-In Clinic
Suite 102
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
(905) 287-2035

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HADEEL FAWZI ELIA ALTITANCHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALTITANCHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HADEEL FAWZI ELIA ALTITANCHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALTITANCHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2015