THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:26:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingsbridge Medical Centre
Ground Floor
33 City Centre Dr, Suite 111
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-507-1111
Fax: 905-890-7102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Nov 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Chera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chera (CPSO#: 107996 )
Business Address: Kingsbridge Medical Centre
111 - 33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
(905) 507-1111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingsbridge Medical Centre
Ground Floor
33 City Centre Dr, Suite 111
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-507-1111
Fax: 905-890-7102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Nov 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Chera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chera (CPSO#: 107996 )
Business Address: Kingsbridge Medical Centre
111 - 33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
(905) 507-1111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BALDEEP CHERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BALDEEP CHERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2015