THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:59:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hawkesbury & District General
Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3025 Boul Tessier
Laval QC H7S 2M1
Phone: 4509347491
Fax: 4509347489

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc-André Allard Medicine Professional Corporation Inc.
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Allard (CPSO#: 107999 )
Business Address: 4826 Rue Richmond
Pierrefonds QC H9A 2W5
514-916-0426

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hawkesbury & District General
Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3025 Boul Tessier
Laval QC H7S 2M1
Phone: 4509347491
Fax: 4509347489

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc-André Allard Medicine Professional Corporation Inc.
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Allard (CPSO#: 107999 )
Business Address: 4826 Rue Richmond
Pierrefonds QC H9A 2W5
514-916-0426

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC-ANDRE ALLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC-ANDRE ALLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015