THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 02:58:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Appletree Medical Group
Suite 20
1450 O'Connor Drive
Toronto Ontario M4B 2T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-722-2370
Fax: 416-477-2015
Address: 2025 Midland Ave
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (647) 490-6330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gopy Arumugam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Arumugam (CPSO#: 108009 )
Business Address: 2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
(647) 722-2370
Business Address: Appletree Medical Group
Suite 20
1450 O'Connor Drive
Toronto Ontario M4B 2T8
(647) 722-2370

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Appletree Medical Group
Suite 20
1450 O'Connor Drive
Toronto Ontario M4B 2T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-722-2370
Fax: 416-477-2015
Address: 2025 Midland Ave
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (647) 490-6330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gopy Arumugam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Arumugam (CPSO#: 108009 )
Business Address: 2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
(647) 722-2370
Business Address: Appletree Medical Group
Suite 20
1450 O'Connor Drive
Toronto Ontario M4B 2T8
(647) 722-2370

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Mar 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 08 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Gopy Arumugam may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Gopy Arumugam may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015